This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 18:09:08 (UTC).

RAYMOND WEST, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, CHERYL WEST, ET AL. VS COVENANT CARE CALIFORNIA, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 RAYMOND WEST, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, CHERYL WEST, filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against COVENANT CARE CALIFORNIA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0282

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAYMOND WEST BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST CHERYL WEST

WEST CHERYL

Defendant

COVENANT CARE CALIFORNIA LLC DBA ROYAL CARE SKILLED NURSING CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHARIBIAN ARTIN

Defendant Attorney

JUNN SUE S.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/6/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Continuance

11/28/2022: Notice of Continuance

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/21/2022

11/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/21/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/31/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/3/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/14/2022: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHERYL WEST

6/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHERYL WEST

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • Hearing02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference re settlement scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27 updated: Result Date to 12/21/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: COVENANT CARE CALIFORNIA, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: RAYMOND WEST, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Cheryl West (Plaintiff); CHERYL WEST (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by RAYMOND WEST, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Cheryl West, et al. on 06/14/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by RAYMOND WEST, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Cheryl West and CHERYL WEST, causes 1st, 2nd, and 3rd Causes of Action only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: RAYMOND WEST, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Cheryl West (Plaintiff); CHERYL WEST (Plaintiff); As to: COVENANT CARE CALIFORNIA, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: RAYMOND WEST, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Cheryl West (Plaintiff); CHERYL WEST (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark C. Kim in Department S27 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed PI Complicated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RAYMOND WEST, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Cheryl West (Plaintiff); CHERYL WEST (Plaintiff); As to: COVENANT CARE CALIFORNIA, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration OF CHERYL WEST; Filed by: RAYMOND WEST, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Cheryl West (Plaintiff); CHERYL WEST (Plaintiff); As to: COVENANT CARE CALIFORNIA, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RAYMOND WEST, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Cheryl West (Plaintiff); CHERYL WEST (Plaintiff); As to: COVENANT CARE CALIFORNIA, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RAYMOND WEST, by and through her Successor-in-Interest, Cheryl West (Plaintiff); CHERYL WEST (Plaintiff); As to: COVENANT CARE CALIFORNIA, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Covenant Care California, Inc. dba Wagner heights Nursing & Rehabilitation Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHARIBIAN ARTIN