Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2021 at 12:34:57 (UTC).

RAYMOND SMITH VS SUN KYU OH

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 RAYMOND SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUN KYU OH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0659

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH RAYMOND

Defendant

OH SUN KYU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW L. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BRISCOE J. JACKSON

 

Court Documents

Answer

11/24/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

11/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

11/9/2020: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

11/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/22/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2023
  • Hearing10/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Hearing04/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • Hearing04/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sun Kyu Oh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Raymond Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Raymond Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Raymond Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Raymond Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRISCOE J. JACKSON