This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2022 at 17:18:35 (UTC).

RAYMOND NAVARRO VS GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 RAYMOND NAVARRO filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2289

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVARRO RAYMOND

Defendant

GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROCKETT THOMAS EDWARD III

Defendant Attorney

LAWRENCE CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/11/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/11/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/11/2022: Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/2/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/2/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2024
  • Hearing07/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2024
  • Hearing01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Goodwill Industries of Southern California (Defendant); As to: Raymond Navarro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Goodwill Industries of Southern California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Raymond Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: Goodwill Industries of Southern California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Raymond Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: Goodwill Industries of Southern California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Raymond Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: Goodwill Industries of Southern California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROCKETT THOMAS E III