This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2021 at 14:28:45 (UTC).

RAYMOND JOHN, JR. VS LEEWARD PARTMENTS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 RAYMOND JOHN, JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LEEWARD PARTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9654

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN JR. RAYMOND

Defendants

LEEWARD PARTMENTS

MCCORMACK BARON MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUSSO ROBERT J

RUSSO ROBERT J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/30/2020: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/30/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

2/2/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PAYMENT OF WAIVED FEES)

5/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PAYMENT OF WAIVED FEES)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PAYMENT OF WAIVED FEES) OF 05/03/2021

5/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PAYMENT OF WAIVED FEES) OF 05/03/2021

Request for Dismissal

4/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (payment of waived fees) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 11:39 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: payment of waived fees)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: payment of waived fees) of 05/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by RAYMOND JOHN, JR. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RAYMOND JOHN, JR. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RAYMOND JOHN, JR. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RAYMOND JOHN, JR. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RAYMOND JOHN, JR. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCCORMACK BARON MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSSO ROBERT J