Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:10:40 (UTC).

RAYMOND GUZMAN VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METRO TRANS AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 RAYMOND GUZMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METRO TRANS AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6013

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GUZMAN RAYMOND

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BANAFSHE P. RYAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NEBENZAHL MICHAEL R. ESQ.

NEBENZAHL MICHAEL RALPH ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AND ADDRESS

9/14/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AND ADDRESS

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

9/14/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

11/2/2018: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

Ex Parte Application

4/26/2019: Ex Parte Application

Notice

4/26/2019: Notice

Minute Order

4/26/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/22/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

6/22/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/26/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for order to continue trial date) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for order to continue trial date)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Trial Continuance); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Defendant LACMTA's Ex Parte Application for Order to Continue Trial Date); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Raymond Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Raymond Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC666013    Hearing Date: July 02, 2020    Dept: 27

The parties are strongly encouraged to appear telephonically based on the spread of COVID-19, the states of emergency having been declared by Governor Gavin Newsom and President Donald Trump, the General Orders issued by the Presiding Judge, and the Statewide Orders issued by the Chief Justice.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

RAYMOND GUZMAN,

Plaintiff,

vs.

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY (LACMTA), and DOES 1 to 25,

Defendants.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

.: BC666013

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

July 2, 2020

On June 22, 2017, plaintiff Raymond Guzman (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendant Los Angeles County Metropolitan Authority (“Defendant”) arising from a November 11, 2016 trip and fall on a bus.  Plaintiff passed away on November 27, 2019 and Maureen Guzman (“Guzman”) seeks to be substituted as his successor-in-interest.  

“A cause of action that survives the death of the person entitled to commence an action or proceeding passes to the decedent’s successor in interest . . . and an action may be commenced by the decedent’s personal representatives or, if none, by the decedent’s successor in interest.”  (Code Civ. Proc., § 377.30.)  After the death of a plaintiff, the court, on motion, shall allow a pending action that does not abate to be continued by the decedent’s personal representative or successor-in-interest.  (Code Civ. Proc., § 377.31.)

The person who seeks to commence or continue a pending action as the decedent’s successor-in-interest shall execute and file an affidavit or declaration stating: (1) the decedent’s name, (2) the date and place of decedent’s death, (3) “No proceeding is now pending in California for administration of the decedent’s estate,” (4) a copy of the final order showing the distribution of the decedent’s cause of action to the successor-in-interest, if the decedent’s estate was administered, (5) either the affiant or declarant is the decedent’s successor in interest or the affiant or declarant is authorized to act on behalf of the decedent’s successor in interest, with facts in support thereof, (6) “No other person has a superior right to commence the action or proceeding or to be substituted for the decedent in the pending action or proceeding,” and (7) the statements are true, under penalty of perjury.  (Code Civ. Proc., § 377.32.)

Guzman submits a copy of Plaintiff’s death certificate and a declaration. declaration setting forth facts supporting Guzman’s authority as Plaintiff’s successor-in-interest.  (Code Civ. Proc. § 377.32(5)[requiring affiant to state basis for succession or authority “with facts in support thereof”].)  Accordingly, the motion is granted.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

Dated this 2nd day of July 2020

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr.

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEBENZAHL MICHAEL R. ESQ.