This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 20:04:05 (UTC).

RAYMOND BERRY VS GRANADA POST ACUTE, L.P. DBA ROYAL OAKS CARE CENTER

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 RAYMOND BERRY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GRANADA POST ACUTE, L P DBA ROYAL OAKS CARE CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8520

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERRY RAYMOND

Defendant

GRANADA POST ACUTE L.P. DBA ROYAL OAKS CARE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PICK LUKAS

Defendant Attorney

SCHADRACK MARK ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/16/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/24/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/27/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION)

9/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION)

Request for Dismissal

11/17/2020: Request for Dismissal

Order

10/30/2019: Order

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

10/31/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (SHAWNDA DORN - CSR # 11387)

10/8/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (SHAWNDA DORN - CSR # 11387)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

10/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MORA IN SUPPORT OF REPLY

9/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MORA IN SUPPORT OF REPLY

Case Management Statement

9/27/2019: Case Management Statement

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9/27/2019: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Objection - OBJECTION TO NEW EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT WITH REPLY PAPERS

10/1/2019: Objection - OBJECTION TO NEW EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT WITH REPLY PAPERS

Case Management Statement

9/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Motion to Compel Arbitration

7/3/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LISA STEVENS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/3/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LISA STEVENS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Arbitration) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Prosecute) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Raymond Berry (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Arbitration) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Lukas Pick (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Lukas Pick (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (Declaration in Support of Opposition to Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Raymond Berry (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Raymond Berry (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Granada Post Acute, L.P. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Lisa Stevens in support of defendants Petition to compel arbitration); Filed by Granada Post Acute, L.P. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Raymond Berry (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Raymond Berry (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Raymond Berry (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less