This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 03:55:50 (UTC).

RAYMOND ARREHBORI VS JOSHUA FRONTINO ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/05/2017 RAYMOND ARREHBORI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSHUA FRONTINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6636

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARREHBORI RAYMOND

Defendants

FRONTINO JOSHUA

WESTFALL JAMIE C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

COHAN SABRINA ESQ.

COHAN SABRINA S

Defendant Attorney

ZIPPE KENT

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/5/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

4/5/2017: SUMMONS

Answer

3/29/2019: Answer

Minute Order

3/4/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

2/28/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/28/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/28/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/28/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

10/5/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/19/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Joshua Frontino (Defendant); Jamie C. Westfall (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Tri...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Raymond Arrehbori (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Raymond Arrehbori (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Raymond Arrehbori (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Raymond Arrehbori (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 7; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Raymond Arrehbori (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6636    Hearing Date: March 18, 2021    Dept: 26

Arrehbori v. Frontino, et al

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP ;; 2030.290, 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Joshua Frontino’s (1) Motion To Compel Responses To Supplemental Interrogatories and Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Supplemental Demand For Production Of Documents and Request for Sanctions are GRANTED AS TO THE ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES. PLAINTIFF RAYMOND ARREHBORI IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION WITHIN 40 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. THE REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS ARE DENIED.

ANALYSIS:

Defendant Joshua Frontino (“Defendant Frontino”) propounded Supplemental Interrogatories and Supplemental Requests for Production of Documents on Plaintiff Raymond Arrehbori (“Plaintiff”) on August 4, 2020. (Motions, Zipe Decl., Exh. A.) Following Plaintiff’s failure to provide timely responses, Defendant Frontino’s counsel sent a meet and confer letter to Plaintiff’s former counsel. (Id. at Exhs. B-C.) Following no response from Plaintiff, Defendant Frontino filed the instant (1) Motion To Compel Responses To Supplemental Interrogatories, Set One; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For Production Of Documents on January 5, 2021. Plaintiff filed a substitution of attorney and oppositions to the Motions on March 5, 2021. Defendant Frontino filed a reply on March 11, 2021.

Based on Plaintiff’s failure to serve initial responses, the Motions to compel responses to the supplemental interrogatories and request for production are granted. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses or deem admissions admitted can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., ;; 2030.290, 2031.300.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., ;; 2030.290, 2031.300.)

Regarding the evidence in opposition that Plaintiff’s former counsel failed to inform him of the discovery or the instant Motion, the Court will give Plaintiff additional time to serve responses. It should be noted that defense counsel declares that Plaintiff’s former counsel represented she had difficulty obtaining responses from Plaintiff. (Motions, Zipe Decl., ¶7.) Defense counsel declares that he is only seeking sanctions against Plaintiff. (Ibid.)

Therefore, Defendant Joshua Frontino’s (1) Motion To Compel Responses To Supplemental Interrogatories and Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Supplemental Demand For Production Of Documents and Request for Sanctions are GRANTED AS TO THE ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES. PLAINTIFF RAYMOND ARREHBORI IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION WITHIN 40 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. THE REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS ARE DENIED.