This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 05:28:38 (UTC).

RAYMOND ARCE VS GIOVANNI D AMORE ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/27/2017 RAYMOND ARCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GIOVANNI D AMORE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9732

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARCE RAYMOND

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

D AMORE GIOVANNI

INCOME ESTATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AIN FARRIS E.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CLINTON DAVID A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

5/1/2018: Notice of Settlement

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

5/4/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Minute Order

8/2/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY (NEGLIGENCE -- PREMISES LIABILITY)

4/27/2017: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY (NEGLIGENCE -- PREMISES LIABILITY)

SUMMONS

4/27/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

4/27/2017: Unknown

DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF, RAYMOND ARCE'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

6/20/2017: DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF, RAYMOND ARCE'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC. AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/20/2017: DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC. AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department SS5, Elaine Lu, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal (AFTER SETTLEMENT) - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • OSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Notice-Settlement (UNCONDITIONAL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Answer to Unverified Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A is a litigant

Latest cases where INCOME ESTATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINTON DAVID A.