This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2022 at 19:49:36 (UTC).

RAUL VALDEZ, ET AL. VS F&S HOLDINGS, INC. A UTAH CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 RAUL VALDEZ, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against F S HOLDINGS, INC A UTAH CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL P. LINFIELD and UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3751

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DE PAZ CESAR

DE PAZ HENRY

LOPEZ LUIS FERNANDO

VALDEZ RAUL

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

F&S HOLDINGS INC. A UTAH CORPORATION

Cross Defendants

CR PLUMBING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DE PAZ C PEREZ

DE PAZ CRISTIAN GUSTAVO PEREZ

VALENZUELA C. VALDEZ

VALENZUELA COSME RAUL VALDEZ

VALDEZ RAUL AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPHSON JACK DAVID

Defendant Attorney

JANNOL HENRY N.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER

12/20/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE A 30 DAY EXTENSION OF THE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO CROSS- COMPLAINT AND DEMURRER TO ANSWER DEADLINE TO ACCOMODATE PLAINTIFFS

12/4/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE A 30 DAY EXTENSION OF THE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO CROSS- COMPLAINT AND DEMURRER TO ANSWER DEADLINE TO ACCOMODATE PLAINTIFFS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC

11/29/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

11/3/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

10/21/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

9/20/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Cross-Complaint

9/29/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

9/29/2022: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) AMENDED

9/30/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) AMENDED

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

9/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST THE HONORABLE, UPI...)

9/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST THE HONORABLE, UPI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST THE HONORABLE, UPI...) OF 09/21/2022

9/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMTORY CHALLENGE AGAINST THE HONORABLE, UPI...) OF 09/21/2022

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/25/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • Hearing02/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation and Order; Signed and Filed by: Raul Valdez (Plaintiff); Luis Fernando Lopez (Plaintiff); Cesar De Paz (Plaintiff); Henry De Paz (Plaintiff); As to: F&S Holdings, Inc. a Utah Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Order: Filed By: Raul Valdez (Plaintiff),Henry De Paz (Plaintiff),Cesar De Paz (Plaintiff),Luis Fernando Lopez (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION RE A 30 DAY EXTENSION OF THE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO CROSS- COMPLAINT AND DEMURRER TO ANSWER DEADLINE TO ACCOMODATE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S SPINAL INJURY; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER: Filed By: Henry De Paz (Plaintiff),Luis Fernando Lopez (Plaintiff),Raul Valdez (Plaintiff),Cesar De Paz (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION RE A 30 DAY EXTENSION OF THE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO CROSS- COMPLAINT AND DEMURRER TO ANSWER DEADLINE TO ACCOMODATE PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S SPINAL INJURY; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: Raul Valdez (Plaintiff); Luis Fernando Lopez (Plaintiff); Cesar De Paz (Plaintiff); Henry De Paz (Plaintiff); As to: F&S Holdings, Inc. a Utah Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 02/07/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation and Order to Continue CMC; Signed and Filed by: Raul Valdez (Plaintiff); Luis Fernando Lopez (Plaintiff); Cesar De Paz (Plaintiff); Henry De Paz (Plaintiff); As to: F&S Holdings, Inc. a Utah Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Order to Continue CMC: Filed By: Luis Fernando Lopez (Plaintiff),Cesar De Paz (Plaintiff),Raul Valdez (Plaintiff),Henry De Paz (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from F&S Holdings, Inc. a Utah Corporation (Defendant) to F&S Holdings, Inc. a Utah Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 51 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Raul Valdez (Plaintiff); Luis Fernando Lopez (Plaintiff); Cesar De Paz (Plaintiff); Henry De Paz (Plaintiff); As to: F&S Holdings, Inc. a Utah Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Raul Valdez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Cesar De Paz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Henry De Paz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Luis Fernando Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less