This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2022 at 15:50:51 (UTC).

RAUL RIVERA VS MAJESTIC INDUSTRY HILLS, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 RAUL RIVERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MAJESTIC INDUSTRY HILLS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8261

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVERA RAUL

Defendant

MAJESTIC INDUSTRY HILLS LLC DBA PACIFIC PALMS RESORT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILHOWER KRISTEN H.

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS ROSEMARIE SUAZO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/18/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/5/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

1/26/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Answer

1/26/2022: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/3/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/27/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

7/27/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2024
  • Hearing10/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • Hearing04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Hearing09/07/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Raul Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Raul Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Raul Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address; Filed by Majestic Industry Hills, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Majestic Industry Hills, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Raul Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Raul Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Raul Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Raul Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAJESTIC INDUSTRY HILLS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA PACIFIC PALMS RESORT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHILHOWER KRISTEN