This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2022 at 10:10:18 (UTC).

RAUL RAYGOZA VS OMAR RAYGOZA

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 RAUL RAYGOZA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against OMAR RAYGOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7818

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAYGOZA RAUL

Defendant

RAYGOZA OMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON JARED

Defendant Attorney

MIGOYA KELLY W.

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/4/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/3/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/3/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/3/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/3/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/3/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/3/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/3/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Answer

8/8/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/8/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO WITHDRAW PUNITIVE DAMAGES

7/13/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO WITHDRAW PUNITIVE DAMAGES

Proof of Personal Service

5/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2025
  • Hearing02/27/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • Hearing08/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • Hearing08/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Omar Raygoza (Defendant); As to: Raul Raygoza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Omar Raygoza (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation and Proposed Order to Withdraw Punitive Damages; Signed and Filed by: Omar Raygoza (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Proposed Order to Withdraw Punitive Damages: Filed By: Omar Raygoza (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Raul Raygoza (Plaintiff); As to: Omar Raygoza (Defendant); Service Date: 04/17/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Raul Raygoza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Raul Raygoza (Plaintiff); As to: Omar Raygoza (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Raul Raygoza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Raul Raygoza (Plaintiff); As to: Omar Raygoza (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Raul Raygoza (Plaintiff); As to: Omar Raygoza (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less