This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 06:11:19 (UTC).

RAUL RANGEL ZAVALA ET AL VS STEPHANIE ZAFRANI ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 RAUL RANGEL ZAVALA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEPHANIE ZAFRANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8888

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ZAVALA RAUL RANGEL

DE LA CRUZ-COBIAN CIPRIANO JAIME

Defendants and Respondents

ZAFRANI STEPHANIE

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HANASSAB FRED F. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SIEGEL EZRA ESQ.

THORDARSON DUSTIN ERIC ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

11/7/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Notice

4/12/2019: Notice

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

5/8/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

5/30/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Request for Judicial Notice

6/10/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

6/10/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Compel

6/10/2019: Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

6/10/2019: Motion to Compel

Request for Judicial Notice

6/10/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Compel

6/10/2019: Motion to Compel

Unknown

4/11/2018: Unknown

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

10/27/2017: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/27/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CoverSheet

7/21/2017: CoverSheet

Summons

7/21/2017: Summons

Complaint

7/21/2017: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Special Interrogatories); Filed by Raul Rangel Zavala (Plaintiff); Cipriano Jaime De La Cruz-Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Raul Rangel Zavala (Plaintiff); Cipriano Jaime De La Cruz-Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Raul Rangel Zavala (Plaintiff); Cipriano Jaime De La Cruz-Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Motion to Compel (Further responses to Demand for Production of Documents); Filed by Raul Rangel Zavala (Plaintiff); Cipriano Jaime De La Cruz-Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Raul Rangel Zavala (Plaintiff); Cipriano Jaime De La Cruz-Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Form Interrogatories); Filed by Raul Rangel Zavala (Plaintiff); Cipriano Jaime De La Cruz-Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by Stephanie Zafrani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Raul Rangel Zavala (Plaintiff); Cipriano Jaime De La Cruz-Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Stephanie Zafrani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Stephanie Zafrani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Raul Rangel Zavala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Raul Rangel Zavala (Plaintiff); Cipriano Jaime De La Cruz-Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Raul Rangel Zavala (Plaintiff); Cipriano Jaime De La Cruz-Cobian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC668888    Hearing Date: January 06, 2020    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTIONS TO COMPEL

On June 10, 2019, Plaintiff filed three motions to compel further responses to form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and requests for production. Plaintiff did not schedule an Informal Discovery Conference. On July 29, 2019, the Court directed the parties to schedule an IDC and continued the motions to September 5, 2019 to allow time for the IDC. Plaintiff still failed to schedule an IDC. On October 4, 2019, Plaintiff brought an ex parte application to continue the trial so that he could attend an IDC before the trial. The Court noted that Plaintiff had had enough time to conduct an IDC, had still not scheduled an IDC, and instead had continued the hearing on the motions to a date after the November 4, 2019 trial date. The Court therefore denied Plaintiff’s ex parte application to continue the trial. On October 21, 2019, Plaintiff brought another ex parte application to continue the trial, which was denied. On October 31, 2019, the Court continued the trial from November 4, 2019 to February 29, 2020 allow the parties to participate in an mandatory settlement conference. The Court did not continue the discovery cutoff dates, which had already passed by October 31.

On December 11, 2019, Plaintiff finally filed a request for an informal discovery conference for December 31, 2019. On December 31, 2019 – the date chosen by Plaintiff’s counsel for the IDC – Plaintiff’s counsel failed to appear. Instead, he sent an appearance counsel who had no authority to resolve the discovery dispute. The Court then continued the IDC to January 2, 2020 and ordered that counsel with decision making authority personally appear on that date.

On January 2, 2020, Plaintiff’s counsel did not appear at the continued IDC. Instead he sent a different appearance counsel who had no authority and knew little about the case. The Court then set an OSC re sanctions for Plaintiff’s counsel failure to appear at the IDC for January 30, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Due to Plaintiff’s counsel’s failure to schedule an IDC for many months even after being directed to do so by the Court, and Plaintiff’s counsel’s failure to appear at two IDCs, the parties were unable to resolve the discovery dispute.

The three motions to compel concern Defendant’s medical history relating to her sudden emergency defense. The disputed discovery asks for information about Defendant’s entire medical history for the last ten years, not limited to the brain cancer she allegedly discovered when she had the seizure and accident. The discovery also asks for irrelevant information such as whether Defendant is married and has children. These discovery requests are over broad and invade Defendant’s right to privacy by seeking medical records and medical history beyond the brain cancer and seizure at issue. Plaintiff refused to meet and confer to narrow the discovery requests.

Further, at this point, the discovery cutoff date and deadline for discovery motions have passed. Therefore this motion is too late.

For these reasons, the motions to compel are DENIED.

Defendant’s request for sanctions is GRANTED in the amount of $1,380, jointly and severally against Plaintiff and Plaintiff’s counsel, to be paid within 20 days of the date of this order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.