This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2023 at 07:13:23 (UTC).

RAUL PEREZ, ET AL. VS POSTAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 RAUL PEREZ, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against POSTAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN A. ELLIS and LYNNE M. HOBBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3373

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEVEN A. ELLIS

LYNNE M. HOBBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORALES PATRICIO

PEREZ MIGUEL

PEREZ RAUL

Defendants

GARRO THOMAS

POSTAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TURLINGTON ALAN S.

Defendant Attorney

GRANDY JAMES LAWTON

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

12/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

12/8/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

12/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint

Summons Summons on Complaint

11/24/2021: Summons Summons on Complaint

Answer

1/7/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/7/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)

4/25/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)

Notice (name extension) Notice Notice of Entry of Order Re Stipulation to Continue Trial

5/4/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice Notice of Entry of Order Re Stipulation to Continue Trial

Motion to Compel (name extension) Motion to Compel DEPOSITION OF THOMAS GARRO AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION PURSUANT TO CCP § 2025.450 AND 2025.480(a);

11/13/2023: Motion to Compel (name extension) Motion to Compel DEPOSITION OF THOMAS GARRO AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION PURSUANT TO CCP § 2025.450 AND 2025.480(a);

Motion to Compel (name extension) Motion to Compel DEPOSITION OF POSTAL DELIVERY LLC’S PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION PURSUANT TO CCP § 2025.450 AND 2025.480(a);

11/13/2023: Motion to Compel (name extension) Motion to Compel DEPOSITION OF POSTAL DELIVERY LLC’S PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION PURSUANT TO CCP § 2025.450 AND 2025.480(a);

Minute Order Minute Order (Final Status Conference)

11/15/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Final Status Conference)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial Date

11/21/2023: Ex Parte Application (name extension) Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial Date

Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial...)

11/22/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial...)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/20/2024

Hearing11/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2024

Hearing04/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2024

Hearing04/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2024

Hearing02/27/2024 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition and Production of Documents re Defendant Thomas Garro

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2024

Hearing02/26/2024 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition and Production of Documents re Defendant Postal Delivery Systems LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial Date: Filed By: RAUL PEREZ (Plaintiff),MIGUEL PEREZ (Plaintiff),PATRICIO MORALES (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 11/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketUpdated -- Alan S. Turlington (Attorney): First Name changed from ALAN to Alan; Last Name changed from TURLINGTON to Turlington

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketAddress for Alan S. Turlington (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial Date scheduled for 11/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to 11/22/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
12/08/2021

DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2021

DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: RAUL PEREZ (Plaintiff); MIGUEL PEREZ (Plaintiff); PATRICIO MORALES (Plaintiff); As to: POSTAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS LLC (Defendant); THOMAS GARRO (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RAUL PEREZ (Plaintiff); MIGUEL PEREZ (Plaintiff); PATRICIO MORALES (Plaintiff); As to: POSTAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS LLC (Defendant); THOMAS GARRO (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RAUL PEREZ (Plaintiff); MIGUEL PEREZ (Plaintiff); PATRICIO MORALES (Plaintiff); As to: POSTAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS LLC (Defendant); THOMAS GARRO (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less