Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2021 at 19:57:37 (UTC).

RAUL ORDONEZ VS AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 RAUL ORDONEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AAA FLAG BANNER MFG CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3710

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORDONEZ RAUL

Defendant

AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN RAY

Defendant Attorney

RANEN JEFFREY SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Answer

3/24/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

2/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/9/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Case Management Statement

2/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/13/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • Hearing05/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Hearing05/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Hearing02/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by AAA Flag & Banner MFG. Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by AAA Flag & Banner MFG. Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by AAA Flag & Banner MFG. Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Raul Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Raul Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Raul Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Raul Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Raul Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Raul Ordonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANEN JEFFREY S