Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2021 at 12:31:43 (UTC).

RAUL HERRERA VS CITY OF PALMDALE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 RAUL HERRERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF PALMDALE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0044

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERRERA RAUL

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF PALMDALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DERBARSEGHIAN AREN

Defendant Attorneys

ROSS JONATHAN A

STOCKALPER PATRICK EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

3/4/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/16/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

3/16/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2024
  • Hearing01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Hearing03/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Hearing03/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Palmdale (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Raul Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Raul Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Raul Herrera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF PALMDALE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSS JONATHAN A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOCKALPER PATRICK E. ESQ