This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 08:08:06 (UTC).

RAUL FIGUEROA, JR. VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 RAUL FIGUEROA, JR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0629

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIGUEROA RAUL JR.

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KECHICHIAN GREGORY K.

AYVAZIAN SALLY A

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

9/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/1/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/27/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Raul Figueroa, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Raul Figueroa, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Raul Figueroa, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Raul Figueroa, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KECHICHIAN GREGORY K.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AYVAZIAN SALLY A