Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 00:17:31 (UTC).

RASTI SHAGHAYEGH VS BPSN II LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 RASTI SHAGHAYEGH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BPSN II LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3412

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHAGHAYEGH RASTI

RASTI SHAGHAYEGH

Defendants

BPSN II LLC

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOBASSERI ROBERT B.

MOBASSERI ROBERT B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

4/12/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/21/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • Hearing08/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Rasti Shaghayegh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:39 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Rasti Shaghayegh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rasti Shaghayegh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rasti Shaghayegh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rasti Shaghayegh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BPSN II LLC DBA RUSSELL WESTBROOK ALFA ROMEO MASERATI OF VAN NUYS is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOBASSERI ROBERT B.