This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 04:23:17 (UTC).

RASHONE ANDRE LEWIS VS SALVADOR CHAIREZ MARTINEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 RASHONE ANDRE LEWIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SALVADOR CHAIREZ MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7715

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LEWIS RAHSONE ANDRE

Defendants and Respondents

MARTINEZ SALVADOR CHAIREZ

DOES 1 TO 20

DART INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HIGGINS RONALD J.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/13/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

4/16/2019: Unknown

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE A. PERSONAL INJURY B. PROPERTY DAMAGE

4/13/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE A. PERSONAL INJURY B. PROPERTY DAMAGE

Order - Dismissal

4/16/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order

9/27/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/16/2019: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal) of 04/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Rahsone Andre Lewis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE A. PERSONAL INJURY B. PROPERTY DAMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less