This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 01:34:13 (UTC).

RASHEED ALI VS WALSH SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/23/2018 RASHEED ALI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WALSH SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9382

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ALI RASHEED

Defendants and Respondents

J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT INC.

WALSH SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS

WALSH CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC

J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION INC.

WALSH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY II LLC

WALSH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

YANG SEUNG ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KELLEY DRYE & WARREN LLP

VISOSKY KATHRYN ANN

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/6/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR MOON & YANG, APC'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

7/19/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE FOR MOON & YANG, APC'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

7/19/2018: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

7/19/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

Minute Order

8/27/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

9/7/2018: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

Order Granting Attorney"s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/14/2018: Order Granting Attorney"s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice of Appearance

3/15/2019: Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

3/15/2019: Notice of Appearance

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

3/20/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

3/20/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

3/25/2019: Minute Order

Notice

3/27/2019: Notice

STIUIATION TO DISMISS CERTAIN ENTITY DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

5/14/2018: STIUIATION TO DISMISS CERTAIN ENTITY DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

3/23/2018: SUMMONS

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Notice (Of Withdrawal); Filed by Walsh Shea Corridor Constructors (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel); Filed by Walsh Shea Corridor Constructors (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order to Show Cause) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause) of 03/25/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order to Show Cause) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDE...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (for Order to Show Cause); Filed by Walsh Shea Corridor Constructors (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rasheed Ali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rasheed Ali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Rasheed Ali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALSH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY II LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALSH CONSTRUCTIONGROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WALSH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant