This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2023 at 05:53:04 (UTC).

RAQUEL MORENO VS MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 RAQUEL MORENO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7352

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO RAQUEL

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

MOLINA HEALTHCARE INC.

SHEETS TODD

Cross Defendant

MATRIX ABSENCE MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOZAFFARI AFSHIN

Defendant Attorney

C.AMUNDSON ESQ. STEVEN

Cross Defendant Attorneys

DE LEON LARA CARDIN

GURNICK MATTHEW D

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/18/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/28/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/11/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Settlement

9/30/2022: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/26/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Order - COURT'S ORDER FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION HEARING HELD 9/12/22

9/14/2022: Order - COURT'S ORDER FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION HEARING HELD 9/12/22

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT MOLINA HE...)

9/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT MOLINA HE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT MOLINA HE...) OF 09/12/2022

9/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT MOLINA HE...) OF 09/12/2022

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE ALEXANDER JOKO CSR#12272

9/12/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE ALEXANDER JOKO CSR#12272

Reply - REPLY CROSS-DEFENDANT MATRIX ABSENCE MANAGEMENT, INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/7/2022: Reply - REPLY CROSS-DEFENDANT MATRIX ABSENCE MANAGEMENT, INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC.'S REPLY

9/7/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC.'S REPLY

Objection - OBJECTION TO AND REQUEST TO STRIKE DEFENDANT MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC.S REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN T

9/7/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO AND REQUEST TO STRIKE DEFENDANT MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC.S REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN T

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/7/2022: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Separate Statement

9/7/2022: Separate Statement

Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANT MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC.S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED AND ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS

9/7/2022: Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANT MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC.S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED AND ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS

Response - RESPONSE CROSS-DEFENDANT MATRIX ABSENCE MANAGEMENT, INC.S RESPONSE TO MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INCS EVIDENTARY OBJECTIONS

9/7/2022: Response - RESPONSE CROSS-DEFENDANT MATRIX ABSENCE MANAGEMENT, INC.S RESPONSE TO MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INCS EVIDENTARY OBJECTIONS

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2023
  • Hearing10/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2023
  • Hearing10/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by Raquel Moreno on 05/11/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Raquel Moreno as to Todd Sheets and Molina Healthcare, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Raquel Moreno (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 14 - Hon. Cherol J. Nelloneffective 07/10/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketAddress for Lara Cardin De Leon (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketAddress for Matthew D Gurnick (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Lara Cardin De Leon (Attorney); Matthew D Gurnick (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 10/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
169 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Raquel Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Molina Healthcare, Inc. (Defendant); Todd Sheets (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Raquel Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Molina Healthcare, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 02/08/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/29/2021 at 08:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAddress for Afshin Mozaffari (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Terry Green in Department 14 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Raquel Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Molina Healthcare, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Raquel Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Molina Healthcare, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Raquel Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Molina Healthcare, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less