Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 08:19:09 (UTC).

RANDY SALVIEJO, ET AL. VS THE MADERA GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 RANDY SALVIEJO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE MADERA GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS and MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1103

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SALVIEJO RANDY

SWARTZBAUGH CHRISTINA

Defendants

TOCAYA MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

THE MADERA GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVELESS ANDREA S.

Defendant Attorneys

SCHROEDER BETH

GOLPER MATTHEW B.

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION

10/7/2020: Order - ORDER PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/14/2020

10/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/14/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Settlement

8/3/2020: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/3/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Case Management Statement

6/19/2020: Case Management Statement

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/19/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MATTHEW GOLPER IN SUPPORT OF MTC ARBITRATION

6/19/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MATTHEW GOLPER IN SUPPORT OF MTC ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/21/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING

1/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

1/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/27/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer - DEFENDANT THE MADERA GROUP, LLC AND TOCAYA MANAGEMENT LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/23/2019: Answer - DEFENDANT THE MADERA GROUP, LLC AND TOCAYA MANAGEMENT LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/17/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:17 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by Randy Salviejo (Plaintiff); Christina Swartzbaugh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketOrder (PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION); Filed by Randy Salviejo (Plaintiff); Christina Swartzbaugh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by THE MADERA GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); TOCAYA MANAGEMENT LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Randy Salviejo (Plaintiff); Christina Swartzbaugh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by TOCAYA MANAGEMENT LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by THE MADERA GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketDefendant the Madera Group, LLC and Tocaya Management LlC's Answer to Complaint; Filed by THE MADERA GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); TOCAYA MANAGEMENT LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Randy Salviejo (Plaintiff); Christina Swartzbaugh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Randy Salviejo (Plaintiff); Christina Swartzbaugh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Randy Salviejo (Plaintiff); Christina Swartzbaugh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Randy Salviejo (Plaintiff); Christina Swartzbaugh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOCAYA MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVELESS ANDREA S.