This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 06:16:51 (UTC).

RANDY DU VS BRUCE RICHLAND ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/30/2017 RANDY DU filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRUCE RICHLAND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4972

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DU RANDY

Respondents and Defendants

RICHLAND BRUCE

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PANAH D. HESS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/30/2017: Complaint

Summons

11/30/2017: Summons

CoverSheet

11/30/2017: CoverSheet

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/21/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/21/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order

5/16/2019: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by D. Hess Panah (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by D. Hess Panah (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Randy Du (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4972    Hearing Date: November 07, 2019    Dept: 2

Du v. Richland, et al

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Randy Du, is GRANTED. Counsel is ordered to fill out the proposed order specifying all future hearing dates scheduled in the action.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAZDANPANAH HESAM DEAN