This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 13:46:04 (UTC).

RANDY COLBERT VS ACTIVUS CONNECT LLC.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 RANDY COLBERT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ACTIVUS CONNECT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6019

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLBERT RANDY

Defendant

ACTIVUS CONNECT LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELMED JONATHAN

Defendant Attorneys

DECLERCQ WILLIAM BENJAMIN

CLEEK ALISA P.

 

Court Documents

Answer - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

5/14/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

Case Management Order

4/16/2021: Case Management Order

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

4/16/2021: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASEANYWHERE)

4/16/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASEANYWHERE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

4/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Order - ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED APPLICATION OF ALISA CLEEK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

4/16/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED APPLICATION OF ALISA CLEEK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM DECLERCQ IN SUPPORT OF ALISA P. CLEEK'S VERIFIED APPLICATION

4/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM DECLERCQ IN SUPPORT OF ALISA P. CLEEK'S VERIFIED APPLICATION

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - VERIFIED APPLICATION OF ALISA P. CLEEK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANT ACTIVUS CONNECT LLC

4/13/2021: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - VERIFIED APPLICATION OF ALISA P. CLEEK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANT ACTIVUS CONNECT LLC

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE VERIFIED APPLICATION OF ALISA P. CLEEK

4/13/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE VERIFIED APPLICATION OF ALISA P. CLEEK

Notice - NOTICE OF ALISA P. CLEEK'S VERIFIED APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL

4/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ALISA P. CLEEK'S VERIFIED APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS STATEMENT

4/5/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS STATEMENT

Notice of Appearance

3/26/2021: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

4/1/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

3/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 03/09/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

3/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 03/09/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

3/9/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 4:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Class and Representative Action Complaint; Filed by Activus Connect LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Class and Representative Action Complaint; Filed by Randy Colbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOrder (Authorizing Electronic Service (CaseAnywhere)); Filed by Randy Colbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOrder (Granting Verified Application of Alisa Cleek to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice); Filed by Activus Connect LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities (in support of the verified application of Alisa P. Cleek); Filed by Activus Connect LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Activus Connect LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;) of 03/09/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Randy Colbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Randy Colbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Randy Colbert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECLERCQ WILLIAM