This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2022 at 21:23:01 (UTC).

RANDY CHEW VS GERALD FRIEDMAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 RANDY CHEW filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GERALD FRIEDMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAURICE A. LEITER and ANTHONY MOHR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3321

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAURICE A. LEITER

ANTHONY MOHR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHEW RANDY AKA RANDOLPH CHEW

Cross Defendants and Defendants

FAIRCHILD BIANCA

FRIEDMAN GERALD

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

FRIEDMAN GERALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FEDALEN MICHAEL JAMES

FEDALEN MICHAEL J

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ANZ ANDREA J.

ANZ ANDREA J

MINTESNOT KRISTYN JENNIFER

EISENBAUM MICHAEL SCOTT

KOLETSKY ROY AARON

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

6/2/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROY A. KOLETSKY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GERALD M. FRIEDMANS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/8/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROY A. KOLETSKY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GERALD M. FRIEDMANS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL S. EISENBAUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GERALD M. FRIEDMANS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/8/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL S. EISENBAUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GERALD M. FRIEDMANS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Brief - BRIEF COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE

6/8/2022: Brief - BRIEF COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE

Motion for Summary Judgment

6/8/2022: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

6/8/2022: Separate Statement

Request for Judicial Notice

6/8/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT CROSS-COMPLAINANT GERALD M. FRIEDMANS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF KRISTYN J.

6/8/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT CROSS-COMPLAINANT GERALD M. FRIEDMANS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF KRISTYN J.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DAT...)

6/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DAT...)

Notice of Ruling

6/10/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/25/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Association of Attorney

4/12/2022: Association of Attorney

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

4/26/2022: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

Notice of Ruling

5/3/2022: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT CROSS-COMPLAINANT GERALD M. FRIEDMANS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR A MOTION; DECLARATION FO

5/13/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT CROSS-COMPLAINANT GERALD M. FRIEDMANS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR A MOTION; DECLARATION FO

Motion to Continue Trial Date

5/13/2022: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, OR IN THE...)

5/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, OR IN THE...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT GERALD FRIEDMANS MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO

6/4/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT GERALD FRIEDMANS MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • Hearing09/27/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • Hearing09/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 54; Jury Trial (with a 9 day estimate) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 54; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Gerald Friedman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DAT...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketBrief (COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE); Filed by Gerald Friedman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 96; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Randy Chew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Randy Chew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Randy Chew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Randy Chew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Randy Chew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Randy Chew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISENBAUM MICHAEL S.