This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 00:19:05 (UTC).

RANDALL MALINOFF VS WIZARD WORLD, INC., ER AL.,

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 RANDALL MALINOFF filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WIZARD WORLD, INC , ER AL . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE and BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8030

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALINOFF RANDALL

Defendants

MAATTA JOHN D.

WIZARD WORLD INC.

KESSLER PAUL

WOLFE & WYMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARPEL DONALD E.

Defendant Attorneys

EISNER JAFFE GORRY CHAPMAN & ROSS

MALLETT ANDREW M.

EISNER MICHAEL

WOLFE & WYMAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

10/25/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

3/1/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

10/24/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

10/24/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/30/2018: Minute Order

Notice

12/13/2018: Notice

Request for Dismissal

2/19/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

11/30/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/30/2019: Minute Order

Notice

12/12/2018: Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/16/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown

3/1/2019: Unknown

Reply

9/20/2018: Reply

Unknown

1/30/2019: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

10/4/2018: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

11/30/2018: Unknown

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

11/30/2018: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

Request for Judicial Notice

9/13/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • at 09:15 AM in Department O; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department K; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 03/01/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Randall Malinoff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department K; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/30/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Notice (Notice of Settlement of Entire Case); Filed by Randall Malinoff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by WIZARD WORLD, INC. (Defendant); PAUL KESSLER (Defendant); JOHN D. MAATTA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Demurrer; Filed by WIZARD WORLD, INC. (Defendant); PAUL KESSLER (Defendant); JOHN D. MAATTA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Demurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2017
  • Notice; Filed by WIZARD WORLD, INC. (Defendant); PAUL KESSLER (Defendant); JOHN D. MAATTA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2017
  • Notice (OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Randall Malinoff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.