This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 00:27:12 (UTC).

RAMSIN SHAMOUNI VS AGOSTINA GALLUZZO

Case Summary

On 11/27/2017 RAMSIN SHAMOUNI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AGOSTINA GALLUZZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4556

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SHAMOUNI RAMSIN

Defendants and Respondents

GALLUZZO.AGOSTINA

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SHEMTOUB MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/27/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

11/29/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

5/13/2019: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RAMSIN SHAMOUNI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by RAMSIN SHAMOUNI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4556    Hearing Date: January 23, 2020    Dept: 29

Shamouni v. Galluzzo

Defendant’s Three Motions to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Request for Production of Documents; Request for Sanctions, is GRANTED.

Plaintiff, Ramsin Shamouni, is ordered to provide verified responses without objection to Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Request for Production of Documents within 20 days. Cal Code Civil Procedure ; 2030.290, ; 2031.300.

Defendant served the foregoing discovery on 10/24/19. Declaration of, Michelle Spencer, Ex. A to all motions. Plaintiff has not responded despite an attempt to meet and confer with Plaintiff's counsel. Id. at ¶¶ 3-4.

The Court imposes total sanctions for all three motions of $705 against Plaintiff, Ramsin Shamouni, and counsel, Shaun Bauman, for the failure to respond to authorized methods of discovery which is discovery abuse. Cal Code Civil Procedure ;2023.010(d).

Moving party is ordered to give notice.