Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 12:54:33 (UTC).

RAMONA WEBB VS KFORCE FLEXIBLE SOLUTIONS, LLC, A FLORIDA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 RAMONA WEBB filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against KFORCE FLEXIBLE SOLUTIONS, LLC, A FLORIDA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7529

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBB RAMONA

Defendants

KFORCE FLEXIBLE SOLUTIONS LLC A FLORIDA CORPORATION

KFORCE STAFFING SOLUTIONS OF CALIFORNIA LLC A FLORIDA CORPORATION

VERITY HEALTH SYSTEM OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KFORCE STAFFING SOLUTIONS OF CALIFORNIA LLC

KFORCE FLEXIBLE SOLUTIONS LLC

VERITY HEALTH SYSTEMS OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROMERO ALAN ESQ.

CABRERA CRISTAL L. ESQ.

ROMERO ALAN

CABRERA CRISTAL L.

Defendant Attorneys

FERNANDEZ LOUISE ANN

IMARA TAZAMISHA H.

 

Court Documents

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

12/16/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/6/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/16/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/23/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

5/6/2021: Answer

Answer

5/19/2021: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

6/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

Case Management Statement

6/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

6/4/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

12/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 12/17/2020

12/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 12/17/2020

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/11/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/14/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • Hearing06/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Verity Health Systems of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by KForce Staffing Solutions of California, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected); Filed by Ramona Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ramona Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by KForce Flexible Solutions, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Verity Health Systems of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ramona Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of 12/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Ramona Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ramona Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ramona Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ramona Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KFORCE FLEXIBLE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VERITY HEALTH SYSTEM OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IMARA TAZAMISHA H.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERNANDEZ LOUISE ANN