Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2021 at 19:58:38 (UTC).

RAMONA RAMIREZ VS ARC ? IMPERIAL VALLEY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 RAMONA RAMIREZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ARC IMPERIAL VALLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3686

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ RAMONA

Defendants

SANTOS ARTURO

RAHIOTIS ALICIA

JOHNSON RICK

MARQUEZ JEANETTE

ARC ? IMPERIAL VALLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • Hearing07/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ramona Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ramona Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ramona Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ramona Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ramona Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ramona Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ramona Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R