Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2020 at 08:44:50 (UTC).

RAMONA HARRISON VS NATALIE ROSE CAHILL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 RAMONA HARRISON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATALIE ROSE CAHILL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1188

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRISON RAMONA

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CAHILL NATALIE ROSE

CAHILL BLAIR

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

MELERO ELISO

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

GOZALO CARLOS

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CAHILL MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUBLETTE CAMM LESLEY

Defendant Attorneys

MIERA ANTHONY MARTIN

GRGURIC SHERRY L

SOLARES ERICK LEONEL

AREVALO ERIC

BORDIN-WOSK JOSHUA D

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

DILTS GREGORY ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/23/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

6/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

Request for Dismissal

6/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Refund / Order

5/7/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Cross-Complaint

3/5/2019: Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint

3/29/2019: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/29/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/29/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Substitution of Attorney

3/26/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

3/26/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service

3/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/5/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Answer - Answer to Complaint

3/7/2019: Answer - Answer to Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

1/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Complaint

1/15/2019: Complaint

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ramona Harrison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Carlos Gozalo (Cross-Defendant); Eliso Melero (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Natalie Rose Cahill (Cross-Complainant); Blair Cahill (Cross-Complainant); Michael Cahill (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docketat 09:20 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Covid-19) of 06/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Covid-19)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ramona Harrison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ramona Harrison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ramona Harrison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ramona Harrison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ramona Harrison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ramona Harrison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ramona Harrison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ramona Harrison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUBLETTE CAMM