This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 01:36:05 (UTC).

RAMON VALDEZ DS VAN EARL PHIPPS ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by RAMON VALDEZ DS VAN EARL PHIPPS in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0511

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

VALDEZ RAMON

PHIPPS VAN EARL

Claimant

NATIONAL INTERSTATE INSURANCE

Respondents and Defendants

PHIPPS EARL

DOES 1 TO 50

WALLWORK FINANCIAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Motion to Consolidate

2/1/2019: Motion to Consolidate

Minute Order

3/19/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

3/25/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Consolidate

4/2/2019: Motion to Consolidate

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

5/8/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

Minute Order

6/4/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Related Case

7/8/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

7/8/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT

7/5/2018: COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/2/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/13/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/19/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/19/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/18/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

1/18/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

SUMMONS

1/18/2018: SUMMONS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Earl Phipps (Defendant); Wallwork Financial Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) (- FSC: 01-08-20 Trial: 01-22-20); Filed by Ramon Valdez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Motion to Consolidate; Filed by Earl Phipps (Defendant); Wallwork Financial Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ramon Valdez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ramon Valdez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Ramon Valdez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Van Earl Phipps (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Ramon Valdez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC690511    Hearing Date: December 13, 2019    Dept: 5

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

ramon valdez,

Plaintiff,

v.

van earl phipps, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC690511

Hearing Date: December 13, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Defendants’ MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Plaintiff Ramon Valdez (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants Van Earl Phipps, R&R Transportation, Inc. and Wallwork Financial Corporation (“Defendants”) following a motor vehicle collision. Defendants move to continue trial the trial date, currently set for January 22, 2020, to July 8, 2020 because the parties have not completed discovery. Per California Rules of Court, rule 3.1332, a trial continuance may be appropriate due to “[a] party's excused inability to obtain essential testimony, documents, or other material evidence despite diligent efforts. . . .” (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1332, subdivision (c).) Here, Defendants rely on the declaration of their counsel, Justin T. Lowtrip (“Counsel”). Counsel states that Plaintiff recently named Defendant R&R Transportation, which first appeared in this action on October 25, 2019, and has not yet had an opportunity to conduct discovery. Further, while the parties have scheduled numerous depositions, the depositions have not been completed. Likewise, Plaintiff has not yet submitted to an independent medical examination. Defendants have set forth “an affirmative showing of good cause” that supports the requested continuance. Plaintiff stipulates to the continuance. Accordingly, the motion is granted. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1332 (c).)

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The trial date, currently set for January 8, 2020, is advanced and vacated. The Court sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: June 24, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: July 8, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be governed by the new trial date. Defendants shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 13, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court