Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2021 at 08:33:14 (UTC).

RAMON LLAMAS VS EVANGELIN SCHULZE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 RAMON LLAMAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EVANGELIN SCHULZE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3300

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LLAMAS RAMON

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

COMMISSARY POST EXCHANGE INC.

AVALOS ERICK

SCHULZE EVANGELIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIEBER MARK

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DE SPELDER ROBERT B.

JOZANA KOREN

Cross Defendant Attorney

VALDEZ LARRY ALLEN TIRADOR

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

2/25/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

11/23/2020: Cross-Complaint

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY

12/7/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

12/9/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/21/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

11/22/2019: Answer

Cross-Complaint

12/5/2019: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/5/2019: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/24/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/3/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/3/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/3/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/3/2019: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ramon Llamas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by COMMISSARY POST EXCHANGE Erroneously Sued As Commissary Post Exchange, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Erick Avalos (Cross-Complainant); Evangelin Schulze (Cross-Complainant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Erick Avalos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ramon Llamas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Non-Service); Filed by Ramon Llamas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOrder and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Ramon Llamas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Evangelin Schulze (Defendant); COMMISSARY POST EXCHANGE Erroneously Sued As Commissary Post Exchange, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Evangelin Schulze (Defendant); COMMISSARY POST EXCHANGE Erroneously Sued As Commissary Post Exchange, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Evangelin Schulze (Defendant); COMMISSARY POST EXCHANGE Erroneously Sued As Commissary Post Exchange, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ramon Llamas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ramon Llamas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ramon Llamas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ramon Llamas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIEBER MARK