This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2019 at 02:41:35 (UTC).

RAMON FRANCO VS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 RAMON FRANCO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9256

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCO RAMON

Defendants

LEDESMA LINDA

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVRETOVICH JOSEPH MARK

Defendant Attorneys

LEE JINA

GROODE STEVEN ANDREW

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/29/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANT FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF RAMON FRANCO'S COMPLAINT

4/30/2018: DEFENDANT FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF RAMON FRANCO'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/30/2018: Minute Order

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

4/3/2018: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/11/2018: Minute Order

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

4/11/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Unknown

4/13/2018: Unknown

Unknown

4/13/2018: Unknown

Unknown

4/17/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/15/2018: DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/15/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS

3/15/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS

DECLARATION OF JINA LEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF RAMON FRANCO'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/15/2018: DECLARATION OF JINA LEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF RAMON FRANCO'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF RAMON FRANCO'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIF

3/28/2018: PLAINTIFF RAMON FRANCO'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIF

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/9/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

1/5/2018: SUMMONS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 16; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Docketat 09:02 AM in Department 16; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ramon Franco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Granting the Parties Joint Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related Pre-Trial Dates; Filed by Frontier Communications Corporation (Defendant); Frontier California Inc. (Defendant); Linda Ledesma (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 16; Ex-Parte Proceedings (to Continue Trial and Related Pre-Trial Dates) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketOrder (granting the parties' joint exparte application to continue trial and related pre-trial dates)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Post-Mediation Status Conference; Ex-Parte Proceedings to Con...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings (to Continue Trial and Related Pre-Trial Dates) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JINA LEE IN SUPPORT OF MEET AND CONFER AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41(A)(2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ramon Franco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. HARASSMENT BASED ON DISABILITY IN VIOLATION OF THE FEHA; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

ORIGINAL

STEVEN A. GROODE, Bar No. 210500

sgroode@littler.com

LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

2049 Century Park East

5th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067.3107

Telephone: 310.553.0308

FaxNo. 310.553.5583 Supefiofii%fif S County of Los Angeles

JINA LEE, Bar No. 263384

jilee@littler.com MAR 15 2018 LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

633 West Fifth Street, 63rd Floor cnarri R, Carter, Exegutive Officer/Clerk Los Angeles, CA 90071 By %wéj_g_?:gg_oepuw Telephone: 213.443.4300 T Yancy Alvarez

Fax No.: 213.4434299

Attorneys for Defendants

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA

INC.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA | COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

RAMON FRANCO, an individual, Case No. BC689256 Plaintiff, ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO

JUDGE RITA MILLER, DEPT. 16 V.

| PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF’S

CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation; UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC, a SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS Califorma corporation; and LINDA ' LEDESMA, an individual; and DOES 1 Date: Apnil 11,2018 through 50, inclusive, Time: 9:00 am

Dept: 16

Defendants.

Reservation # 180314297830

Complaint Filed: January 5, 2018

PROOF OF SERVICE

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVRETOVICH, JOSEPH M