Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 01:44:03 (UTC).

RAMON FLORES VS OMEGA ENERGY, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2020 RAMON FLORES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against OMEGA ENERGY, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6100

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES RAMON

Defendant

OMEGA ENERGY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENFIELD SHELDON

Defendant Attorneys

CLARK EVAN ALEXANDRA

PRINCE DAVID LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EVAN A. CLARK, ESQ. REGARDING DEADLINE TO HOLD MEETING/CONFERENCE WITH PLAINTIFF/RESPONDENT

3/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EVAN A. CLARK, ESQ. REGARDING DEADLINE TO HOLD MEETING/CONFERENCE WITH PLAINTIFF/RESPONDENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER;)

4/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER;)]

4/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER;)]

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EVAN A. CLARK, ESQ. REGARDING RESULT OF REQUEST TO LABOR COMMISSIONER FOR PLAINTIFF/RESPONDENT'S CONTACT/SERVICE INFORMATION

2/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EVAN A. CLARK, ESQ. REGARDING RESULT OF REQUEST TO LABOR COMMISSIONER FOR PLAINTIFF/RESPONDENT'S CONTACT/SERVICE INFORMATION

Notice of Ruling

2/9/2021: Notice of Ruling

Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

2/1/2021: Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Substitution of Attorney

12/18/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/18/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

1/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/12/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Undertaking - UNDERTAKING BOND

4/30/2020: Undertaking - UNDERTAKING BOND

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF LODGING BY DEFENDANT-APPELLANT OMEGA ENERGY, INC. OF UNDERTAKING PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 98.2

4/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF LODGING BY DEFENDANT-APPELLANT OMEGA ENERGY, INC. OF UNDERTAKING PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 98.2

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/28/2020: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • Hearing04/22/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Labor Commission Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 2:52 PM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order;)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Evan A. Clark, Esq. Regarding Deadline to Hold Meeting/Conference with Plaintiff/Respondent); Filed by Omega Energy, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Evan A. Clark, Esq. Regarding Result of Request to Labor Commissioner for Plaintiff/Respondent's Contact/Service Information); Filed by Omega Energy, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Omega Energy, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Preparation Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Omega Energy, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Omega Energy, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketUndertaking (bond)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ramon Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF LODGING BY DEFENDANT-APPELLANT OMEGA ENERGY, INC. OF UNDERTAKING PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 98.2); Filed by Ramon Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ramon Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OMEGA ENERGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLARK EVAN ALEXANDRA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE DAVID LOUIS