This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2022 at 06:38:11 (UTC).

RAMIRO VASQUEZ VS BARONHR WEST, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 RAMIRO VASQUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BARONHR WEST, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9909

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VASQUEZ RAMIRO

Defendants

RAMIREZ EDUARDO

NATIONAL RETAIL SYSTEMS INC.

BARONHR WEST INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAN KA IN

NALBANDYAN A. JACOB

Defendant Attorneys

CARLON JOSHUA DAVID

WELCH ERIC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENFORE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT)

11/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENFORE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT)

Notice of Ruling

11/29/2021: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

11/30/2021: Order - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT]

12/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT]

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN D. HANDLEY, ESQ. RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

12/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN D. HANDLEY, ESQ. RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

12/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CASUE RE: DISMISSAL

12/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CASUE RE: DISMISSAL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN HANDLEY RE: DISMISSAL

12/23/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN HANDLEY RE: DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RYAN D. HANDLEY, ESQ. RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

1/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RYAN D. HANDLEY, ESQ. RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FOR DEFENDANT, BARON HR WEST, INC.'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE 01/18/

1/20/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FOR DEFENDANT, BARON HR WEST, INC.'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE 01/18/

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ERIC M WELCH, ESQ. RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FOR DEFENDANT, BARONHR WEST, INC.'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE JANUARY 18, 2022 HEARING

1/26/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ERIC M WELCH, ESQ. RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FOR DEFENDANT, BARONHR WEST, INC.'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE JANUARY 18, 2022 HEARING

Request for Dismissal

1/26/2022: Request for Dismissal

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENFORE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

11/8/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENFORE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/8/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Settlement

11/8/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

11/9/2021: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: (Contempt for Defendant, Baronhr West, Inc.'s Failure to Appear at the 01/18/22 Hearing) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF ERIC M WELCH, ESQ. RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT FOR DEFENDANT, BARONHR WEST, INC.'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE JANUARY 18, 2022 HEARING); Filed by BARONHR WEST, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ramiro Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiffs Notice Of Hearing On Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) And Order To Show Cause Re: Contempt For Defendant, Baron HR West, Inc.'s Failure To Appear At The 01/18/22 Hearing); Filed by Ramiro Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF RYAN D. HANDLEY, ESQ. RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)); Filed by Ramiro Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BARONHR WEST, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ramiro Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Case Management Conference); Filed by Ramiro Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer (Baroniir West, Inc's Answer to Complaint); Filed by BARONHR WEST, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by BARONHR WEST, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ramiro Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ramiro Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ramiro Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less