This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2022 at 07:11:08 (UTC).

RAMIRO MARTINEZ GOMEZ VS DAMCO INTERNATIONAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 RAMIRO MARTINEZ GOMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAMCO INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0377

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ RAMIRO MARTINEZ

Defendants

DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SERVICES INC.

DAMCO INTERNATIONAL

DAMCO USA INC.

FLORES VICTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ BARBARA MARIA

ORAN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

LERNER NEIL S

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/11/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

8/28/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

8/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE

11/30/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE

Answer

11/29/2021: Answer

Answer

11/29/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

11/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT REQUEST AND STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE

11/9/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT REQUEST AND STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT REQUEST AND STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE

11/9/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT REQUEST AND STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE

Association of Attorney

10/27/2021: Association of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Hearing03/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketOrder (Proposed Order Vacating Trial Date); Filed by Damco Distribution Services, Inc. (Defendant); Victor Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Damco Distribution Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Victor Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ramiro Martinez Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ramiro Martinez Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Request And Stipulation To Vacate Trial Date); Filed by Damco Distribution Services, Inc. (Defendant); Victor Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Ramiro Martinez Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ramiro Martinez Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ramiro Martinez Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ramiro Martinez Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ramiro Martinez Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAMCO USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DAMCO DISTRIBUTION SERVICES INC. DBA HUDD TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ BARBARA MARIA