This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 12:44:41 (UTC).

RAMIRO LEMUS GUZMAN VS EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 RAMIRO LEMUS GUZMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EAN HOLDINGS, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0091

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEMUS GUZMAN RAMIRO

Defendants

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

RASK THEODORE A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWANSON BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorney

JOACHIM LINDSAY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/10/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/16/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/16/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/29/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, Fsc (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

11/8/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, Fsc (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2025
  • Hearing02/10/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • Hearing06/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • Hearing06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, Fsc (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (North District); Signed and Filed by: EAN HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); THEODORE A. RASK (Defendant); As to: RAMIRO LEMUS GUZMAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, Fsc (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (North District): Filed By: EAN HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 06/16/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 06/07/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, Fsc (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (North District); Proposed - Received by: EAN HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); THEODORE A. RASK (Defendant); As to: RAMIRO LEMUS GUZMAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: RAMIRO LEMUS GUZMAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/30/2025 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 02/10/2025 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Final Status Conference scheduled for 04/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 04/05/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/30/2025 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen Morgan in Department A14 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RAMIRO LEMUS GUZMAN (Plaintiff); As to: EAN HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); THEODORE A. RASK (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RAMIRO LEMUS GUZMAN (Plaintiff); As to: EAN HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); THEODORE A. RASK (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RAMIRO LEMUS GUZMAN (Plaintiff); As to: EAN HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); THEODORE A. RASK (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWANSON BENJAMIN D