Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2020 at 16:09:16 (UTC).

RAMIRO BRAVO VS SEA LOGIC LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 RAMIRO BRAVO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SEA LOGIC LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9974

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Petitioners, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BRAVO RAMIRO

BLOCK TIERRA

RODRIGUEZ FRANCISCO JAVIER

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SEA LOGIC LLC

SEA LOGIX LLC

BRAVO RAMIRO

DOES 1 TO 50

RODRIGUEZ FRANCISCO JAVIER

RYDER TRUCK RENTAL LT

RYDER TRUCK RENTAL INC

RYDER TRUCK RENTAL DBA RYDER TRANSPORTATION SERVICES

SEA LOGIX LLC DOE 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HAKIM GEORGE

FIRM JOSEPH FARZAM LAW

FARZAM JOSEPH S.

LOWENTHAL JOHN S.

CHILDERS BRADLEY PETER

ACKER STEPHEN

MCINTIRE CHRISTOPHER A.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CHILDERS BRADLEY PETER

ACKER STEPHEN

VALDEZ LARRY ALLEN TIRADOR

MCINTIRE CHRISTOPHER A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)

10/22/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED)

Notice of Settlement

9/1/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 09/02/2020

9/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 09/02/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

9/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/09/2020

1/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/09/2020

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1/16/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED C...) OF 11/05/2019

11/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED C...) OF 11/05/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED C...) OF 11/05/2019

11/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED C...) OF 11/05/2019

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Related Case

7/23/2019: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 07/23/2019

7/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 07/23/2019

Answer

7/3/2019: Answer

Answer

7/3/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

9/5/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

8/30/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

SUMMONS -

8/30/2018: SUMMONS -

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • Hearing08/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Hearing12/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tierra Block (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ramiro Bravo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ((not entered)); Filed by Francisco Javier Rodriguez (Defendant); Sea Logix LLC (Defendant); Ryder Truck Rental LT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docketat 09:28 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Francisco Javier Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tierra Block (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Tierra Block (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tierra Block (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Ramiro Bravo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ramiro Bravo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RYDER TRUCK RENTAL LT is a litigant

Latest cases where SEA-LOGIX LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCINTIRE, CHRISTOPHER A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILDERS BRADLEY PETER