This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2022 at 07:03:57 (UTC).

RAMIREZ, SARAH NADINE VS VARGAS, JOSE

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 RAMIREZ, SARAH NADINE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against VARGAS, JOSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YANG, BRYANT Y. and YRIARTE, GEANENE M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0857

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YANG, BRYANT Y.

YRIARTE, GEANENE M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAMIREZ SARAH NADINE

Respondent

VARGAS JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

UNGAR MICHAEL T.

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

6/7/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Proof of Service

6/7/2022: Proof of Service

Minute Order

6/7/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service

6/3/2022: Proof of Service

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

5/18/2022: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

5/18/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

5/18/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

5/18/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Petition - Civil Harassment (violence)

5/18/2022: Petition - Civil Harassment (violence)

Response - Civil Harassment (violence)

7/20/2022: Response - Civil Harassment (violence)

Minute Order

7/20/2022: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Yriarte, Geanene M, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment (violence); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department K, Yang, Bryant Y., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer UNGAR MICHAEL T.