This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2023 at 03:39:30 (UTC).

RAMIREZ, ROSA ELENA GARCIA VS VEGA, ALFREDO ROMAN JIMENEZ

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 RAMIREZ, ROSA ELENA GARCIA filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against VEGA, ALFREDO ROMAN JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PELLMAN, AMY M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0001

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PELLMAN, AMY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAMIREZ ROSA ELENA GARCIA

Respondent

VEGA ALFREDO ROMAN JIMENEZ

Not Classified By Court

GASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

REYES LUCIA ALESSANDRA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

7/26/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

Order - Findings and Order After Hearing

7/26/2022: Order - Findings and Order After Hearing

Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

7/11/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

Minute Order

5/27/2022: Minute Order

Order - re Governing Release of Interviews with Minors

5/27/2022: Order - re Governing Release of Interviews with Minors

Minute Order

5/24/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/23/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/18/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/17/2022: Minute Order

Stipulation

5/17/2022: Stipulation

Response - Response

5/13/2022: Response - Response

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

4/14/2022: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

FL_General Family Law - FW003 Order on Ct Fee Waiver.pdf

4/13/2022: FL_General Family Law - FW003 Order on Ct Fee Waiver.pdf

Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications - Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications

4/13/2022: Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications - Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications

Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

4/13/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

Proof of Service

4/7/2022: Proof of Service

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/26/2022

DocketProof of Service (Proof of Electronic Service ); Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022

DocketOrder - Findings and Order After Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2022

DocketProposed Order - After Hearing - Findings and Order (Proposed Order - After Hearing - Findings and Order ); Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketProposed Order - After Hearing - Findings and Order (Proposed Order - After Hearing - Findings and Order ); Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022

DocketProof of Service (Proof of Electronic Service ); Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2022

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2022

DocketOrder (re Governing Release of Interviews with Minors ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2022

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022

Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Submitted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
04/07/2022

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2022

DocketProof of Service; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2022

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (Petition for a Warrant in Liue of a Writ of Habeas Corpus ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Habeas Corpus ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (Memorandum of Law: The Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction, done at the Hague, Oct. 25, 1980; and the International Child Abduction Remedies Act, U.S.C. 9001, et. seq. ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketNotice (of Application for the Return of the Minor Minor Children under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (Petition for Return of Minor Children to Petitioner under the Hague Convention and Declaration of Rosa Alarcon ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and Authorities in support of Expedited Proceedings under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less