This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2021 at 12:10:30 (UTC).

RAMIREZ MASONRY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS BERNARDS BROS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 RAMIREZ MASONRY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BERNARDS BROS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0512

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ MASONRY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

BERNARDS BROS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MASONIC HOMES OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRONSTEIN CRAIG PENNER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/21/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/21/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

7/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

Notice - NOTICE WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

8/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

Request for Dismissal

8/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (Withdrawal of Notice of Pending Action); Filed by Ramirez Masonry, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ramirez Masonry, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ramirez Masonry, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ramirez Masonry, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Pending Action); Filed by Ramirez Masonry, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ramirez Masonry, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ramirez Masonry, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ramirez Masonry, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MASONIC HOMES OF CALIFORNIA A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BERNARDS BROS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAIG P. BRONSTEIN