This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2022 at 08:16:40 (UTC).

RAMIN KAHEN VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 RAMIN KAHEN filed an Other lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5041

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAHEN RAMIN

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

PENSKE BUICK GMC OF SOUTH BAY

CADILLAC OF BEVERLY HILLS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YASHAR NADIA ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

ROYBAL KYLE BEREND

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

9/3/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/07/2021

9/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/07/2021

Notice of Ruling

8/19/2020: Notice of Ruling

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/19/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

8/19/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/21/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

8/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/15/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

6/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

3/16/2020: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/20/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/3/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ramin Kahen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial ((4-5 day estimate)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 09/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Ramin Kahen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default for Defendant Cadillac) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal of Defendant Penske) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Ramin Kahen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Kyle Berend Roybal (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ramin Kahen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ramin Kahen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ramin Kahen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CADILLAC OF BEVERLY HILLS is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROYBAL KYLE B.