This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 05:13:02 (UTC).

RAMIN GHADERI NASRABAD VS PETER PREDRAG DROBNJALEOVIC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 RAMIN GHADERI NASRABAD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PETER PREDRAG DROBNJALEOVIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4222

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NASRABAD RAMIN GHADERI

Defendant

DROBNJALEOVIC PETER PREDRAG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROCK CAMERON Y.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

9/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

10/22/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2024
  • Hearing09/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • Hearing03/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • Hearing03/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ramin Ghaderi Nasrabad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ramin Ghaderi Nasrabad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ramin Ghaderi Nasrabad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ramin Ghaderi Nasrabad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROCK CAMERON Y