This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 01:31:24 (UTC).

RALPHS GORCERY COMPANY ET AL VS LINCOLN CENTER LLC

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 RALPHS GORCERY COMPANY filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against LINCOLN CENTER LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1745

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

ALPHA BETA COMPANY

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

LINCOLN CENTER LLC

Cross Defendant

THE KROGER COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

KESSLER DANIEL J. ESQ.

KESSLER DANIEL JOSEPH ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BRUBAKER MARK EUGENE

PAHL DOUGLAS JOHN

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXERCISE RIGHT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDGE BARBARA MEIERS PURSUANT TO CC.P. ? 170.6; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

3/7/2017: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXERCISE RIGHT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDGE BARBARA MEIERS PURSUANT TO CC.P. ? 170.6; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DECLARATION OF AMBER M. SANCHEZ, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO EXERCISE RIGHT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDGE BARBARA A. MEJERS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ? 170.6

3/7/2017: DECLARATION OF AMBER M. SANCHEZ, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO EXERCISE RIGHT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDGE BARBARA A. MEJERS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ? 170.6

Minute Order

3/8/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

3/27/2017: Unknown

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) EJECTMENT (2) BREACH OF LEASE (3) PUBLIC/PRIVATE NUISANCE (4) TRESPASS

4/17/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) EJECTMENT (2) BREACH OF LEASE (3) PUBLIC/PRIVATE NUISANCE (4) TRESPASS

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/21/2017: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED CONCURRENTLY

5/2/2017: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED CONCURRENTLY

DECLARATION OF MARK E. BRUEAKER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LINCOLN CENTER, LLC'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

5/2/2017: DECLARATION OF MARK E. BRUEAKER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LINCOLN CENTER, LLC'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE

5/2/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN CONNECTION WITH DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

5/2/2017: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN CONNECTION WITH DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/5/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT KROGER COMPANY

5/12/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT KROGER COMPANY

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/15/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CROSS-DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/22/2017: CROSS-DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

9/15/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Unknown

9/15/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/15/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/15/2017: Unknown

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Notice (of New Trial Date); Filed by Ralphs Grocery Company (Plaintiff); Alpha Beta Company (Plaintiff); The Kroger Company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • at 3:37 PM in Department 57; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/02/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Stipulation and Order ( to Continue Trial and All Related Statutory Deadlines); Filed by Ralphs Grocery Company (Plaintiff); Alpha Beta Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF NEW TRIAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 57; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 12; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-03-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Ralphs Grocery Company (Plaintiff); Alpha Beta Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Ralphs Grocery Company (Plaintiff); Alpha Beta Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DECLARATION OF AMBER M. SANCHEZ, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXERCISE RIGHT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDGE BARBARA A. MEJERS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 170.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXERCISE RIGHT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDGE BARBARA MEIERS PURSUANT TO CC.P. 170.6; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LINCOLN CENTER LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ALPHA BETA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant