This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 23:09:02 (UTC).

RAJINDER SINGH VS CLEAR RECON CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 RAJINDER SINGH filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CLEAR RECON CORP . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7336

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINGH RAJINDER

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO IN THE SUBJECT PROPERTY LOCATED AT 12241 214TH STREET HAWAIIAN GARDENS CALIFORNI

BEAR STEARNS ALT-A TRUST 11 2007-1

CLEAR RECON CORP.

PNC BANK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/12/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION RE: NOTICE OF EX PARTE MOTION

10/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION RE: NOTICE OF EX PARTE MOTION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

10/21/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/28/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Declaration - [AMENDED] DECLARATION RE. NOTICE OF EX-PARTE MOTION AND EX-PARTE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ENJOINING OR PRECLUDING FORECLOSURE SALE

10/28/2021: Declaration - [AMENDED] DECLARATION RE. NOTICE OF EX-PARTE MOTION AND EX-PARTE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ENJOINING OR PRECLUDING FORECLOSURE SALE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Rajinder Singh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docket[Amended] Declaration Re. Notice of Ex-Parte Motion and Ex-Parte Motion for Preliminary Injunction Enjoining or Precluding Foreclosure Sale; Filed by Rajinder Singh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for order to show cause) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (re: Notice of ex parte motion); Filed by Rajinder Singh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for order to show cause); Filed by Rajinder Singh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rajinder Singh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rajinder Singh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEAR STEARNS ALT-A TRUST 2006-2 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006-2 is a litigant

Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Clear Recon Corp is a litigant