Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 22:26:28 (UTC).

RAJASUBRAMANIA, SATHYA VS. RAJASUBRAMANIA, JAYANTHI

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 RAJASUBRAMANIA, SATHYA filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against RAJASUBRAMANIA, JAYANTHI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0039

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAJASUBRAMANIA SATHYA

Respondent

RAJASUBRAMANIA JAYANTHI

 

Court Documents

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt - Amended Petition

4/19/2021: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt - Amended Petition

Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition

4/19/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition

Summons

3/17/2021: Summons

Petition - Amended (1st)

3/17/2021: Petition - Amended (1st)

Declaration - UCCJEA

3/17/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Proof of Service of Summons

1/28/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

1/28/2021: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

Summons

1/13/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/13/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Legal Separation w/ Minor Child

1/13/2021: Petition - Legal Separation w/ Minor Child

Declaration - UCCJEA

1/13/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Notice - Case Assignment

1/13/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/13/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt - Amended Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPetition - Amended (1st); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketPetition - Legal Separation w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less