Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2021 at 13:28:23 (UTC).

RAHELEH RASSAI SHECK VS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 RAHELEH RASSAI SHECK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9280

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHECK RAHELEH RASSAI

Defendants

ALBERTSON'S LLC

CALABASAS RETAIL PARTNERS LLC

ALBERTSON'S REALTY LLC

NEW ALBERTSONS L.P.

ALBERTSON'S STORES SUB LLC

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC.

SAFEWAY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLRED CYNTHIA

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/30/2020: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.; ALBERTSONS REALTY LLC; ALBERTSONS STORES SUB LLC; NEW ALBERTSONS L.P.; SAFEWAY INC.;

9/22/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.; ALBERTSONS REALTY LLC; ALBERTSONS STORES SUB LLC; NEW ALBERTSONS L.P.; SAFEWAY INC.;

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY

1/4/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY

Proof of Personal Service

2/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/22/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/1/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/1/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/1/2019: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Hearing08/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • Hearing07/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketOrder and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by RAHELEH RASSAI SHECK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.; ALBERTSON?S REALTY LLC; ALBERTSON?S STORES SUB LLC; NEW ALBERTSONS L.P.; SAFEWAY INC.; AND CALABASAS RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC; [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by ALBERTSON'S LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ALBERTSON'S LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by RAHELEH RASSAI SHECK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RAHELEH RASSAI SHECK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RAHELEH RASSAI SHECK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RAHELEH RASSAI SHECK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RAHELEH RASSAI SHECK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RAHELEH RASSAI SHECK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RAHELEH RASSAI SHECK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RAHELEH RASSAI SHECK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RAHELEH RASSAI SHECK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S REALTY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW ALBERTSONS P.C. DBA PAVILIONS is a litigant