This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 15:54:09 (UTC).

RAHEISHA LATRICE ROBERSON VS AUSTREBERTO LOPEZ ARELLANO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 RAHEISHA LATRICE ROBERSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUSTREBERTO LOPEZ ARELLANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3985

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERSON RAHEISHA LATRICE

Defendants

LOPEZ ARELLANO AUSTREBERTO

USA WASTE CALIFORNIA INC.

WASTE MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEHJATNIA RUSSELL F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2024
  • Hearing09/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • Hearing03/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Raheisha Latrice Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Raheisha Latrice Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Raheisha Latrice Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASTE MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEHJATNIA RUSSELL F. ESQ.