This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2019 at 03:04:03 (UTC).

RAFIK Y. KAMELL VS. KENNETH SOLOMON

Case Summary

On 03/07/2018 RAFIK Y KAMELL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KENNETH SOLOMON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER and MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6987

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KAMELL RAFIK Y. AN INDIVIDUAL

KAMELL RAFIK

KAMELL AN INDIVIDUAL RAFIK

WOODARD AN INDIVIDUAL DAVID DANIEL

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

SOLOMON KENNETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KAMELL RAFIK Y. LAW OFFICES OF

KAMELL ESQ. RAFIK YOUSSEF

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

ZURAWSKI JAMES PATRICK

CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN DEAN ROEB & BARGER

BARGER ESQ. GLENN THEODORE

WEINBERGER DAVID

GUPTA MOLSHREE

LAW OFFICES OF JAMES P. ZURAWSKI

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQ FOR SANCTIONS

10/7/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQ FOR SANCTIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

6/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/27/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

6/27/2019: Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Notice of Ruling

5/30/2019: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER RE: HEARING OF 5/23/19

5/23/2019: Order - ORDER RE: HEARING OF 5/23/19

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)

5/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY RAFIK Y. KAMELL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAMES P. ZURAWSKI

5/16/2019: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY RAFIK Y. KAMELL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAMES P. ZURAWSKI

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINT.' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY

5/9/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINT.' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

4/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Answer

4/3/2019: Answer

Motion to Disqualify Counsel

4/8/2019: Motion to Disqualify Counsel

Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER OF DEFENDANT KENNETH SOLOMON TO CROSS- COMPLAINANT KENNETH SOLOMONS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY RAFIK Y. KAMELL

4/11/2019: Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER OF DEFENDANT KENNETH SOLOMON TO CROSS- COMPLAINANT KENNETH SOLOMONS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY RAFIK Y. KAMELL

Amended Complaint - (Amended)

3/5/2019: Amended Complaint - (Amended)

Order - hearing of 3/5/19

3/5/2019: Order - hearing of 3/5/19

Notice of Ruling

3/6/2019: Notice of Ruling

Opposition - Opposition Leave to file First Amended Complaint

2/22/2019: Opposition - Opposition Leave to file First Amended Complaint

Reply - Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend

2/26/2019: Reply - Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • Hearing02/25/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Hearing02/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Hearing02/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel ( Further Responses to Special Interrogatories and Req for Sanctions); Filed by RAFIK KAMELL, an individual (Plaintiff); David Daniel Woodard, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by KENNETH SOLOMON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by RAFIK KAMELL, an individual (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing (CASE RESASSIGNMENT AND ORDER MAILED TO PARTIES ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment & Ord (FROM CASE 17VESC09484 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by RAFIK KAMELL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RAFIK KAMELL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by RAFIK KAMELL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC066987    Hearing Date: June 25, 2020    Dept: SEC

KAMELL v. SOLOMON

CASE NO.: VC066987

HEARING: 06/25/2020

JUDGE: OLIVIA ROSALES

#10

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiffs’ motion to compel further responses to special interrogatories is DENIED as MOOT. CCP §2030.300

Opposing Party to give Notice.

Plaintiffs seek to compel further responses to the following Special Interrogatories:

SI No. 7: Identify each Law Enforcement Department for which you have been retained during the past 25 years.

SI No. 12: Identify each case in which you gave an expert witness deposition in which you opined that the law enforcement vehicle to be at fault for a traffic collision.

SI No. 14: Identify each case in which you gave an expert witness trial testimony in which you opined that an expert witness was at fault for a traffic collision.

“If the propounding party, on receipt of a response to interrogatories, deems that (1) an answer to a particular interrogatory is…incomplete…or (3) an objection to an interrogatory is without merit or too general, that party may move for an order compelling further response.” (CCP §2030.300(a).)

When a party serves supplemental responses after a motion to compel further responses has been filed, a court has substantial discretion in deciding how to rule in light of the particular circumstances presented. (Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 408.) For example, a court has discretion to deny the Motion as moot.

On June 12, 2020, Defendant served Plaintiff(s) with supplemental responses to SI Nos. 7, 12, and 14. The Court has reviewed Defendant’s supplemental responses and finds that Defendant served supplemental responses responsive to all of the special interrogatories at issue, and that Defendant’s responses are more complete. (Weinberger Decl., Ex. A.) Plaintiffs’ Motion to Compel Further Responses is DENIED as MOOT.

“The court shall impose a monetary sanction under Chapter 7…against any party, person, or attorney who unsuccessfully makes or opposes a motion to compel a further response to interrogatories, unless it finds that the one subject to the sanction acted with substantial justification or that other circumstances make the imposition of the sanction unjust.” (CCP §2030.300(d).)

Plaintiffs did not technically prevail on this Motion. However, where supplemental responses were served after a motion to compel further is filed, the Court has discretion to deny a motion to compel further as moot, and just impose sanctions. (Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 409.) The Court finds that sanctions are not warranted under the facts and circumstances of this case due to deficiencies in the parties’ meet and confer efforts. Counsel are encouraged to make sufficient efforts to informally resolve their discovery disputes prior to resorting to motion practice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARGER, GLENN T

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEINBERGER DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUPTA MOLSHREE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZURAWSKI JAMES P. ESQ.