This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2021 at 12:08:47 (UTC).

RAFFI PARSEGHIAN VS MARIA RAMOS ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 RAFFI PARSEGHIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA RAMOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BENNY C. OSORIO, ELAINE LU, DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH, RUPERT A. BYRDSONG, SAMANTHA JESSNER, DAVID J. COWAN and MARC D. GROSS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9820

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BENNY C. OSORIO

ELAINE LU

DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

SAMANTHA JESSNER

DAVID J. COWAN

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

PARSEGHIAN RAFFI

Respondents and Defendants

RAMOS MARIA

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

DOES 1 TO 30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

HG LAW APC

GALADZHYAN AYKANUSH HEIDI

KARAPETIAN HYKA HEIDI

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

HUNT JAMES A. ASST. GENERAL COUNSEL

SCHAEFER ERIC R. (GENERAL COUNSEL)

FEUER MICHAEL CITY ATTORNEY

SCHAEFER ERIC R. GENERAL COUNSEL

RAFFALOW BRETOI & ADAMS

RAFFALOW BRETOI LUTZ & STELE

SCHAEFER ERIC ROBERT

WILLIS KIMBERLY RACHELLE

DIARIAN GREG

HUNT JAMES ALBERT

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

5/18/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

5/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 05/18/2021

5/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 05/18/2021

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/26/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 03/29/2021

3/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 03/29/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

3/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Notice of Settlement

3/29/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

3/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/26/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DIS...) OF 03/09/2021

3/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DIS...) OF 03/09/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DIS...)

3/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DIS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/11/2021

3/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/11/2021

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/8/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/27/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Case Management Order

7/17/2020: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/7/2020: Case Management Statement

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 05/18/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Status Conference ((Post-MSC)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 11:18 AM in Department 39; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) of 03/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Raffi Parseghian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Hyka Heidi Karapetian (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; EXHIBITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLATNTIFF COMPLAINT; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Eric Schaefer re Inabililty to Meet & Confer Before Filing a Demurrer to Complaint & Automatic 30-Day Extension to Respond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Raffi Parseghian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9820    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 5

Raffi Parseghian v. Maria Ramos, et al.

Case No. ****9820

This case is being transferred to an Independent Calendar court.  Therefore, the ex parte application is denied as moot.  This order is without prejudice to re-raising the issue if necessary.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHAEFER ERIC R. (GENERAL COUNSEL)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIARIAN GREG

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT JAMES ALBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIS KIMBERLY RACHELLE