This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 04:41:30 (UTC).

RAFFI GUEDIKIAN, ET AL. VS LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 RAFFI GUEDIKIAN, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0778

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUEDIKIAN DINA K.

GUEDIKIAN RAFFI

Defendant

LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEOSIAN HAROUT GREG

Defendant Attorney

BOOS NICHOLAS J

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REMOVAL)

3/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REMOVAL)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

3/20/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 01/23/2023

1/23/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 01/23/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

1/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

12/21/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/9/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/3/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

8/22/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Answer

8/30/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/8/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Raffi Guedikian, et al. on 06/08/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re: Removal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Removal scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W updated: Result Date to 03/21/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE; Filed by: Liberty Insurance Corporation (Defendant); As to: Raffi Guedikian (Plaintiff); Dina K. Guedikian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Removal scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 01/23/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 02/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Liberty Insurance Corporation; On the Complaint filed by Raffi Guedikian, et al. on 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Raffi Guedikian (Plaintiff); Dina K. Guedikian (Plaintiff); As to: Liberty Insurance Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Raffi Guedikian (Plaintiff); As to: Liberty Insurance Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 06/29/2022; Service Cost: 172.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Virginia Keeny in Department W Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Raffi Guedikian (Plaintiff); Dina K. Guedikian (Plaintiff); As to: Liberty Insurance Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Raffi Guedikian (Plaintiff); Dina K. Guedikian (Plaintiff); As to: Liberty Insurance Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Raffi Guedikian (Plaintiff); Dina K. Guedikian (Plaintiff); As to: Liberty Insurance Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less